Estate of Ke Zhengguang v. Stephany
Plaintiff: Estate of Ke Zhengguang
Defendant: Yu Naifen Stephany
Case Number: 8:2018cv03546
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:202
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING pre-motion telephone conference call on January 24, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. AND DIRECTING Respondent's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/14/2019. (sb2, Chambers)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #25 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Yu Naifen Stephany answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/11/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 27 Correspondence re: Request, under Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions (ECF No. 20), for Leave to Move to Dismiss (Baratz, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 26 QC NOTICE: #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **A motion and proposed order must be filed separately. The motion should be filed as the main document and proposed order as separate attachments to the main document. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on Consent by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven)
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Michael. Directing attorney Charles Michael to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Defendant's answer or motion in response to Plaintiff's petition is now due 1/11/19. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2018. (sb2s, Chambers)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant/Respondent to Respond to Petition by Yu Naifen Stephany (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Michael (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7738862.) by Yu Naifen Stephany(Baratz, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lars H Liebeler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/18/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Yu Naifen Stephany (Baratz, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Baratz on behalf of Yu Naifen Stephany (Baratz, Michael)
December 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Abram Cash on behalf of Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lars Liebeler by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Liebeler, Lars)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang. Yu Naifen Stephany served on 12/2/2018, answer due 12/26/2018.(Liebeler, Lars)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **Refile using the Civil event - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Petition served on Yu Naifen Stephany on 12/02/2018, filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang.(Liebeler, Lars) Modified on 12/6/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY as to Estate of Ke Zhengguang re: #7 Notice (Other). Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Estate of Ke Zhengguang Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (Liebeler, Lars)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Yu Naifen Stephany. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Estate of Ke Zhengguang re #1 Complaint, Summons (Liebeler, Lars)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/19/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Estate of Ke Zhengguang, Yu Naifen Stephany or counsel for Estate of Ke Zhengguang, Yu Naifen Stephany are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/3/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT To Recognize / Enforce Foreign Arbitration Award against Estate of Ke Zhengguang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7677851.), filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebeler, Lars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Ke Zhengguang v. Stephany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ke Zhengguang
Represented By: Lars H Liebeler
Represented By: Steven Abram Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Naifen Stephany
Represented By: Charles Michael
Represented By: Michael J Baratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?