Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC v. Courtesy Professional Security, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Courtesy Professional Security, Inc., Davetta Poitier-Kelly and Robert Kelly
Case Number: 8:2018cv03573
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Courtesy Professional Security, Inc., Robert Kelly and Davetta Poitier-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/27/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC re 2 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, #1 Complaint, 8:18-cv-03573-PWG (Pappas, Natalie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC re #1 Complaint, 8:18-cv-03573-PWG (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Courtesy Professional - Copy 2, #2 Summons Davetta Poitier-Kelly - Copy 1, #3 Summons Davetta Poitier-Kelly - Copy 2, #4 Summons Robert Kelly - Copy 1, #5 Summons Robert Kelly - Copy 2)(Pappas, Natalie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC was filed with the following attachment missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. **Re-file your Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement using the Civil Event - Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 18-3573 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7683069.), filed by Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Contract, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Billing Statement, #5 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Pappas, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC v. Courtesy Professional Security, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy Professional Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davetta Poitier-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Small Business Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Kane Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?