JM & GW Enterprises et al v. The Matworks Company LLC
Plaintiff: Jodie Leamer and JM & GW Enterprises
Defendant: The Matworks Company LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv03650
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JM & GW Enterprises, Jodie Leamer.(Sidle, Barton)
January 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Matworks Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maskol, Cynthia)
January 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Sever filed by The Matworks Company LLC.(Maskol, Cynthia)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Sever , RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Sever filed by JM & GW Enterprises, Jodie Leamer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Contract 2016, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Contract 2017, #4 Attachment Text for Proposed Order)(Sidle, Barton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JM & GW Enterprises, Jodie Leamer (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Contract 2016, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Contract 2017, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 E-mail, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 Affidavit, #6 Attachment Text for Proposed Order)(Sidle, Barton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JM & GW Enterprises, Jodie Leamer identifying Corporate Parent Jodie Leamer for JM & GW Enterprises.(Sidle, Barton)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever by The Matworks Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Maskol, Cynthia)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Correspondence re: Defendant's Removal Statement (Maskol, Cynthia)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Matworks Company LLC (Maskol, Cynthia)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Matworks Company LLC. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/30/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, MD, case number CAL 18-36215. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7694999), filed by The Matworks Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B State Court Info Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex C State Court Writ of Summons, #5 Exhibit Ex D State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Maskol, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JM & GW Enterprises et al v. The Matworks Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Leamer
Represented By: Barton J Sidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM & GW Enterprises
Represented By: Barton J Sidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Matworks Company LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L Maskol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?