Falkenstein v. Rahman et al

Plaintiff: John W. Falkenstein
Defendant: Dr. Ashraf, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Bernice Swan, Dr. Yaya, Kimberly Growden, Dr. Ava Joubert-Curtis, Sam Rhaman, Peggy Mahler, Ryan Browning, Beverly McLaughlin, Medical Director Brenda Reese, John Doe, Tiffany Bennett and Sam Rahman
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2018cv03715
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Conrad Meister on behalf of Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (Meister, Douglas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Smith on behalf of Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (Smith, Gina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence re refusing service on behalf of Ashraf, Tiffany Bennett, Ryan Browning, John Doe, Kimberly Growden, Ava Joubert-Curtis, Peggy Mahler, Beverly McLaughlin, Office of the Attorney General, Sam Rahman, Brenda Reese, Bernice Swan, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Yaya (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Office of the Attorney General Notice of Refusal to Accept Service on Behalf of Defendants (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplement Complaint, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 Third Supplemental to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence from John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by John W. Falkenstein ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #11 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m&e 1/15/19 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Sharon Baucom, M.D., #2 Exhibit 2 Medical Records, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Benjamin Bradley)(Lane Weber, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 Second Supplemental to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/17/2019 (nu, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence from John Falkenstein requesting copy work and evidence (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Subpoena Duces Tecum by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2019: #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (sp2, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(nu, Deputy Clerk) (Originally received on 12/21/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Correspondence from John Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Counsel to Show Cause within 21 days. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/19/2018. (c/m 12/20/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Finance Officer to file an Inmate Account Summary Information Report and Certificate within 21 days. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/5/2018. (c/m 12/6/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John W. Falkenstein (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(sp2, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #2 Envelope) (sp2, Deputy Clerk).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashraf, Tiffany Bennett, Ryan Browning, John Doe, Kimberly Growden, Ava Joubert-Curtis, Peggy Mahler, Beverly McLaughlin, Brenda Reese, Sam Rhaman, Bernice Swan, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Yaya, filed by John W. Falkenstein.(sp2, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #1 Envelope) (sp2, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falkenstein v. Rahman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ashraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Growden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ava Joubert-Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Rhaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director Brenda Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Falkenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?