Eastridge v. Brost

Plaintiff: Christopher Eastridge
Defendant: Carolina Brost
Case Number: 8:2018cv03770
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2679
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Lift the Stay in Light of Restoration of appropriations; the Telephone Case Management Conference is Rescheduled for February 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/28/2019. (c/m 1/29/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/29/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Lift Stay and Schedule Conference Call by Carolina Brost(Andersen, Jane)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MARGINAL ORDER granting in part #10 Motion to Adjourn Telephone Conference in Light of Lapse of Appropriations; case stayed for Thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/18/2019. (c/m 1/18/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION to Continue Telephone Conference by Carolina Brost(Andersen, Jane)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference scheduled for January 3, 2019 at 3:00 p.m.; Case Management Conference on Defendant's Notice of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss is rescheduled to January 24, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/3/2019. (c/m 1/3/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue January 3 Telephone Conference by Carolina Brost(Andersen, Jane)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: A Case Management Conference is schedule for January 3, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. to Discuss Defendant's Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss. (c/m 12/17/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Carolina Brost.(Andersen, Jane)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Carolina Brost of Intent to File a Motion (Andersen, Jane)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carolina Brost. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/7/2018. (c/m 12/7/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Correspondence from Clerk to Pro-Se Plaintiff regarding Notice of Removal. (c/m 12/7/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/7/2018. (c/m 12/7/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Prince Georges County, case number 050200334942018., filed by Carolina Brost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint, #5 Notice to Defendant)(Andersen, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastridge v. Brost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Eastridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Brost
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?