Stanley v Peracha
Plaintiff: Cheryl Stanley
Defendant: Hameed U. Peracha
Case Number: 8:2018cv03786
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hameed U. Peracha. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/11/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Cheryl Stanley or counsel for Cheryl Stanley are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/26/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7716803.), filed by CHERYL STANLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bender, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v Peracha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Stanley
Represented By: Bruce M Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hameed U. Peracha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?