C.C. et al v. University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travis Cooper, Carmen Cooper, Leighara Cooper and C.C.
Defendant: University of Maryland Community Medical Group, Inc. and University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03891
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 QC NOTICE: 22 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Leighara Cooper and C.C., Travis Cooper was filed incorrectly. **Refile using the Civil Event - Correspondence - Magistrate Judge-consent to. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #20 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/14/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/14/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER approving the alternations to the discovery deadlines and deposition hour limits jointly proposed in #16 . Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/13/19. (nrs, Chambers)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Upton Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Ronald)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by C.C., Leighara Cooper, Travis Cooper Joint Request for Modification of Scheduling Order (McNamara Koch, Mary)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/30/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kieran Murphy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Murphy, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Louise Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Sarah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary V McNamara Koch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McNamara Koch, Mary)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Louise Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc., University of Maryland Community Medical Group, Inc. (Morrow, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint, , ANSWER to #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint, by University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc., University of Maryland Community Medical Group, Inc..(Morrow, Thomas)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/19/2018. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc. and University of Maryland Community Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith David Forman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Forman, Keith)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Jury Trial Demand by C.C., Leighara Cooper, Travis Cooper(Forman, Keith)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by C.C., Leighara Cooper, Travis Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Forman, Keith)
December 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith David Forman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Forman, Keith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Jury Trial Demand by Carmen Cooper, Leighara Cooper, Travis Cooper(Forman, Keith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7734871.), filed by Carmen Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit CQE & Report, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons)(Forman, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.C. et al v. University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Community Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Upton Shaw
Represented By: Thomas C Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Upton Shaw
Represented By: Thomas C Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Cooper
Represented By: Keith David Forman
Represented By: John Kieran Murphy
Represented By: Mary V McNamara Koch
Represented By: Sarah Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cooper
Represented By: Keith David Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leighara Cooper
Represented By: Keith David Forman
Represented By: John Kieran Murphy
Represented By: Mary V McNamara Koch
Represented By: Sarah Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.
Represented By: Keith David Forman
Represented By: John Kieran Murphy
Represented By: Mary V McNamara Koch
Represented By: Sarah Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?