Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
Case Number: 8:2018cv03944
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ashbury, Heather)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #12 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission or counsel for Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/15/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (Ashbury, Heather)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission.(Ashbury, Heather)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019.(Kushnir, Vlad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Affidavit of Service filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on LaTanya M. Adam on 01/10/2019, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.(Kushnir, Vlad) Modified on 1/17/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/15/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vlad Kushnir. Directing attorney Vlad Kushnir to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Ackerman, Alan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement was filed using the incorrect event. Re-file using the Civil Event - Other Filings - Other Documents - Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. The Statement must be filed by 12/28/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vlad Kushnir (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7745230.) by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Federal Courts' Admissions)(Ackerman, Alan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint - DISCLOSURE OF AFFILIATIONS AND FINANCIAL INTEREST (Ackerman, Alan) Modified on 12/21/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint - Proposed Summons (Ackerman, Alan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet (Ackerman, Alan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/20/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company or counsel for Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/3/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company was filed with the following attachments missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7743981.), filed by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O EAGLEBANK.(Ackerman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
Represented By: Heather L Ashbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan Jay Ackerman
Represented By: Vlad Kushnir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?