Burgess v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Burgess
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00123
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/25/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Burgess. United States of America served on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019.(McManus, Thomas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Burgess. United States of America served on 2/1/2019, answer due 4/2/2019.(McManus, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Burgess. United States of America served on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019.(McManus, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Attorney.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jo Ann Burgess re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons for US Attorney for District of Maryland (McManus, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Jo Ann Burgess was filed with the following attachment missing - Proposed Summons for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney General.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/14/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Jo Ann Burgess or counsel for Jo Ann Burgess are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/28/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7779966.), filed by Jo Ann Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed)(McManus, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Burgess
Represented By: Thomas A McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?