Linemark Printing, Inc. v. Malik

Plaintiff: Linemark Printing, Inc.
Defendant: Darlene Malik
Case Number: 8:2019cv00141
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Consent Order and Permanent Injunction by Linemark Printing, Inc.(Kamins, Scott)
March 15, 2019 Settlement Conference held on 3/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jmm, Chambers)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Friday, March 15, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The settlement conference will be held in my chambers (Suite 335A) in the Greenbelt courthouse (6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770). Counsel may submit written letters, either jointly or separately, via email to MDD_TJSchambers@mdd.uscourts.gov no later than 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, March 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/6/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 Telephone Conference held on 3/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jmm, Chambers)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/6/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by Linemark Printing, Inc.(Kamins, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Darlene Malik(Holzman, Lawrence)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing the February 28, 2019 conference call as follows: The March 1, 2019 hearing was cancelled and the TRO was extended, as modified. Counsel will meet and confer face to face to attempt in good faith to agree upon terms of preservation, confidentiality, and a protective order. They shall file a status report by noon on Tuesday, March 5, 2019. If the parties cannot agree, then Defendant may file a motion to quash, with the parties' briefs not to exceed 15 pages and with the key parts of any exhibits highlighted. A hearing is set for March 28, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/5/19. (lmys, Chambers)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Continuing Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 Status Conference held on 2/28/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Request to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Linemark Printing, Inc.. (Kamins, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Sanctions for Noncompliance with Temporary Restraining Order by Linemark Printing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kamins, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE on Thursday February 28, 2019 at 9:30AM AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/27/2019. (ats, Chambers)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Holzman, Lawrence)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Roger Holzman on behalf of Darlene Malik (Holzman, Lawrence)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linemark Printing, Inc.. Darlene Malik served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019.(Kamins, Scott)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/19/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 3/1/2019 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/15/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Linemark Printing, Inc. filed on 2/15/2019 was deficient. See attachment for details. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Darlene Malik.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, by Linemark Printing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Linemark Printing, Inc. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darlene Malik ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033879.), filed by Linemark Printing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2019: #2 Summons) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linemark Printing, Inc. v. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Malik
Represented By: Lawrence Roger Holzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linemark Printing, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Victor Kamins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?