Daley v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Shomari Salim Daley
Defendant: Christopher Calangan, Christine M. Collins and Kim Pendely
Case Number: 8:2019cv00144
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/4/2019. (cm 03/05/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days to file a Supplement to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/24/2019. (cm 01/28/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/16/2019. (c/m 01/16/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shomari Salim Daley.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Calangan, M. Christine Collins and Kim Pendely, filed by Shomari Salim Daley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Calangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Pendely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shomari Salim Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?