Toft v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kent Toft
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00161
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 47 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
March 30, 2020 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 44 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND ADDRESS Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER in case 8:19-cv-00161-PWG; granting (367) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric R Harlan terminated in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/6/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00161-PWG(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER in case 8:19-cv-00161-PWG; Granting (366) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Mark Sandler terminated in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/6/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00161-PWG(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 38 Correspondence re: Bellwether Selection Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER finding #10 as moot. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/1/2019. (el2s, Chambers)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint ESI Protocol by Gretchen Ehle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Alternative Service by Yisroel MannAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Schlachet, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Donna Hiteshew of Withdrawal of Eve Lynn J. Rapp from Consumer Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Katrina Carroll Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Carroll, Katrina)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and FRE(D) and (E) CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Appointing Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 26 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Travis on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Johnsgard on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 3 Transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Bourne on behalf of Dianne King Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Bourne, Joseph)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 MDL Certified Transfer Order No. 2 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 MDL Certified Transfer Order No. 1 Transferring the cases listed to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER clarifying that the process and deadline for applying for the positions of plaintiffs' lead counsel, liaison counsel, and steering committee will be discussed at the Case Management Conference on April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/19/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(lmys, Chambers)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Tellis on behalf of Kathleen Frakes Hevener, Peter Maldini, Tamara Wallace Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Tellis, Roland)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by David Sparks, Peter Tapling Acceptance of Appointment as Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge George Jarrod Hazel no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order transferring this case to MDL 2879. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/14/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brant D Penney. Directing attorney Brant D Penney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Garrett Dennis Blanchfield, Jr. Attorney Garrett Dennis Blanchfield, Jr will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa M Ghannoum. Directing attorney Lisa M Ghannoum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel R Warren. Directing attorney Daniel R Warren to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Other Relief Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Suspending Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brant D. Penney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7793540.) by Kent Toft(Harlan, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Garrett D. Blanchfield (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7793504.) by Kent Toft(Harlan, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa M. Ghannoum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7792615.) by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel R. Warren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7792607.) by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC identifying Other Affiliate Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC for Marriott International, Inc..(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7788373.), filed by Kent Toft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Marriott International, Inc., #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC)(Harlan, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toft v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Toft
Represented By: Eric R Harlan
Represented By: Paul Mark Sandler
Represented By: Brant D Penney
Represented By: Garrett Dennis Blanchfield, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?