Benchmark Electronics, Inc. v. Myers
Plaintiff: Benchmark Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Nick Myers
Case Number: 8:2019cv00242
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser on behalf of Benchmark Electronics, Inc. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. Benchmark Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019.(Petesch, Peter)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Nick Myers.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Final Arbitration Award against Nick Myers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7804285.), filed by Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Petesch, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchmark Electronics, Inc. v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Petesch
Represented By: Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?