O'Sullivan et al. v. Lindauer

Plaintiff: Susan Lindauer, OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC, Chasity Brown, Diana C. Theologou, Laura T. Curry, Lauren Bush, Laura H. G. O'Sullivan, Kelly Lynn Howard and Erin M. Shaffer
Case Number: 8:2019cv00265
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (c/m 2/21/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence from the Circuit Court for Montgomery County re: Remand (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration re #10 Order Remanding case to Montgomery County Circuit Court; #13 Plaintiff's request to file a motion to remand is moot. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/12/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Win-Teh Chang on behalf of OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC (Chang, Edward)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: approval to file Motion to Remand (Chang, Edward)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration by Susan Lindauer(McKnight, Thomas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence from Clerk re: Remand of case (c/m 2/6/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Remanding case to Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/6/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal (Order to Docket) filed by Susan Lindauer (Attachments: #1 Response to Civil Lawsuit, #2 Second Amended Answer, #3 Motion to Consolidate, #4 Motion to Consolidate, #5 Motion to Stop Foreclosure, #6 Order Denying Motion to Stop Foreclosure, #7 Amended Response to Motion to Stay, #8 Response to Motion to Stay Sale of Property, #9 Line to File Foreclosure Documents, #10 Deed of Trust, #11 Preliminary Loss Mitigation Affidavit, #12 Final Loss Mitigation Affidavit, #13 Criminal Acts of Consumer Fraud by OCWEN, #14 Request for Mediation, #15 Response to Mediation)(km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #16 Memorandum to Assignment Office, #17 Motion for an Emergency Stay, #18 Amended Motion for an Emergency Stay, #19 Amended Motion for an Emergency Stay Exhibit) (km4s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #20 Order of Court, #21 Order Granting Motion to Strike, #22 Order re Motion to Reconsider Order, #23 Motion to Reconsider Order, #24 Order Denying Motion to Set Aside or Vacate, #25 Order Granting Motions to Consolidate, #26 Opposition to Motion to Set Aside or Vacate, #27 Opposition Motion to Set Aside Exhibits, #28 Motion to Set Aside or Vacate, #29 Motion to Strike) (km4s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #30 Notice of Withdrawal, #31 Notice of New Case Number, #32 Affidavit of Mailing, #33 Military Affidavit, #34 Single Record Request, #35 Status Report, #36 Affidavit Certifying Ownership, #37 Adjustable Rate Balloon Note, #38 Allonge, #39 True Copy Affidavit re Deed of Trust, #40 True Copy Affidavit re Assignment, #41 True Copy Affidavit re Substitute Trustees, #42 Notice of Intent to Foreclose, #43 Loss Mitigation Packet, #44 Notice of Foreclosure Action, #45 Request for Mortgage Assistance, #46 Substitution of Trustee, #47 Line to File Foreclosure Documents) (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #4 Order filed by Susan Lindauer.(McKnight, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to for Relief Pursuant to Rule 2-632 Stay of Enforcement (from State Court) by Susan Lindauer(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 2/5/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/31/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/31/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/30/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Susan Lindauer was filed incorrectly. **The Notice of Removal was not filed. Please re-file the documents as a Supplemental with the Notice of Removal as the main document and the Civil Cover Sheet and each state court document as separate attachments to the main document. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number 412218-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7807439), filed by Susan Lindauer.(McKnight, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan et al. v. Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lindauer
Represented By: Thomas Kerns McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Edward Win-Teh Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana C. Theologou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura T. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura H. G. O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lynn Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin M. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?