Morgan Stanley v. Babu
Plaintiff: . Morgan Stanley and Morgan Stanley
Defendant: Nirav Babu
Case Number: 8:2019cv00489
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to Nirav Babu by Morgan Stanley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bass, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2019 to add Motion for Entry of Default (tds, Deputy Clerk).
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley. Nirav Babu served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019.(Bass, Timothy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley.(Bass, Timothy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Nirav Babu.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Bass, Timothy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Morgan Stanley was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Morgan Stanley was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Hearing re #1 Complaint, #4 Notice (Other), Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Bass, Timothy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Donald N. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(Bass, Timothy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Morgan Stanley Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Bass, Timothy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley (Bass, Timothy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nirav Babu ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848278.), filed by Morgan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley v. Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirav Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: . Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?