Middel v. Middel et al

Plaintiff: Jacob E. Middel
Defendant: Jacob R. Middel, Old Silver Hill, LLC and Wellington-Richmond Investments, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00498
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; Directing Defendants to file their response to Plaintiffs initial complaint by May 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/2/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Jacob E. Middel was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect docketing event was used. The correct event is Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed by Jacob E. Middel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rotbert, Mitchell) Modified on 4/1/2019 (rss, Deputy Clerk).
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob E. Middel. Old Silver Hill, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019.(Rotbert, Mitchell)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob E. Middel. Wellington-Richmond Investments, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019.(Rotbert, Mitchell)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob E. Middel. Jacob R. Middel served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019.(Rotbert, Mitchell)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/22/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Jacob E. Middel or counsel for Jacob E. Middel are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/8/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jacob R. Middel, Old Silver Hill, LLC, Wellington-Richmond Investments, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jacob E. Middel (Rotbert, Mitchell)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7849011.), filed by Jacob E. Middel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed summons on Defendant Jacob R. Middel, #3 Summons proposed summons on Defendant Old Silver Hill, LLC, #4 Summons proposed summons on Defendant Wellington-Richmond Investments, LLC)(Rotbert, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middel v. Middel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob R. Middel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Silver Hill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington-Richmond Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob E. Middel
Represented By: Mitchell J Rotbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?