Cynthia Husebo et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Tidd and Cynthia Husebo
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc., .
Case Number: 8:2019cv00504
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Travis on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Johnsgard on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 3 Transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of MDL case. (c/e-m 2/25/19 with ECF 3 in PWG 19-md-2879 (Order)) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-02545. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2879, transferring case to USDC, District of Maryland and assigned to Honorable Paul W. Grimm. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of (1) Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings; and (2) Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, List of Pending Actions)(Matthias, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10490-AB-AGR, 2:18-cv-10034-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10173-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10234-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10324-DSF-MRW, and 2:18-cv-10390-DSF-MRW (Matthias, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Matthias counsel for Defendants Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. Adding Michael R. Matthias as counsel of record for Marriott International, Inc. and Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.. (Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Matthias, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION BY JPML #13 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Decision By JPML filed by Defendants Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chow, Teresa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., identifying Marriott International, Inc.. (Chow, Teresa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., (Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chow, Teresa)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10034 DSF(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-2545 DSF(MRWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (ad)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. (car)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (car)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Monesi, Trisha)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFFS Cynthia Husebo, Matthew Tidd. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Request re Marriott Hotel Services)(Monesi, Trisha)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Husebo, Matthew Tidd. (Monesi, Trisha)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22837881 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFFS Cynthia Husebo, Matthew Tidd. (Attorney Trisha Kathleen Monesi added to party Cynthia Husebo(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha Kathleen Monesi added to party Matthew Tidd(pty:pla))(Monesi, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Husebo et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Husebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., .
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?