Sonny's Franchise Company v. Savoy
Plaintiff: Sonny's Franchise Company
Defendant: Paulette Savoy
Case Number: 8:2019cv00538
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonny's Franchise Company. Paulette Savoy served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019.(Subar, Ilana)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sonny's Franchise Company (Subar, Ilana)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Paulette Savoy.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Deficiency Notice Sonny's Franchise Company Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/1/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/21/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paulette Savoy ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7849798.), filed by Sonny's Franchise Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons)(Subar, Ilana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonny's Franchise Company v. Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny's Franchise Company
Represented By: Ilana Subar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?