Koydol, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Koydol, Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00612
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Hartford Fire Insurance Company or counsel for Hartford Fire Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/18/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(McLaughlin, Lauren)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(McLaughlin, Lauren)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koydol, Inc.. Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019.(Webster, Lucas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Affidavit of Service filed by Koydol, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Exhibits, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Hartford Fire Insurance Company on 03/07/19, filed by Koydol, Inc..(Webster, Lucas) Modified on 3/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/27/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Koydol, Inc. or counsel for Koydol, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/13/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Koydol, Inc. (Webster, Lucas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7859440.), filed by Koydol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Webster, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koydol, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koydol, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas Farinato Webster
Represented By: Kevin B Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren Pacelli McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?