Asmelash v. Adsystech, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yodit Asmelash
Defendant: Roland Gillis and Adsystech, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00699
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO SCHEDULING ORDER by Adsystech, Inc.(McCollum, James)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/5/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.5 Certification (Attachments: #1 Notice of New Case Number, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(McCollum, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Roland Gillis' ANSWER to Complaint by Roland Gillis.(Kaplan, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #2 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Adsystech, Inc..(McCollum, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Yodit Asmelash (Emejuru, Ikechukwu)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Adsystech, Inc..(McCollum, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Adsystech, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Adtech Information Systems, Ltd. for Adsystech, Inc..(McCollum, James)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Adsystech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/11/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 460942-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7875963), filed by Adsystech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Information Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Docket Information, #6 Scheduling Notice, #7 Scheduling and Pretrial Hearing Notice, #8 Scheduling Order)(McCollum, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asmelash v. Adsystech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yodit Asmelash
Represented By: Ikechukwu K Emejuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Gillis
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adsystech, Inc.
Represented By: James E McCollum, Jr
Represented By: Amit Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?