Moore v. J.W. Marriott, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: John P. Moore
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab, Mary K. Bush, Marriott International Inc, Lawrence W. Kellner, Deborah M. Harrison, Debra L. Lee, J.W. Marriott, Jr., Steven S Reinemund, Frederick A. Henderson, Aylwin B. Lewis, George Munoz, Arne M. Sorenson, Eric Hippeau and Bruce W. Duncan
Case Number: 8:2019cv00830
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF 658 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's federal security claims (Counts IV, V and VI) and dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's Delaware State law claims (Count I, II, and III) as to ECF 624 Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Second Amended Consolidated Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/11/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun YurtkuranAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Lai, Erica)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re (49 in 8:19-cv-00830-PWG, 40 in 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 658 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Deborah Marriott Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Bruce Hoffmeister, Lawrence W. Kellner, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International, Inc., J.W. Marriott Jr., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Arne M. Sorenson.Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Mendro, Jason)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 QC NOTICE: #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by John P. Moore, John P. Moore was filed incorrectly. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. **In the future, please list all corresponding case numbers on your filing. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re (49 in 8:19-cv-00830-PWG, 658 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by John P. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory M, Egleston, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration of John P. Moore, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(O Connell, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING 686 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of One of the Plaintiffs Without Prejudice. All claims brought by Plaintiff Edmund Alves in this action against all defendants are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, unless otherwise agreed. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/12/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(imws, Chambers)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Second Amended Consolidated Complaint by Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Deborah Marriott Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Bruce Hoffmeister, Lawrence W. Kellner, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International, Inc., J.W. Marriott Jr., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Arne M. Sorenson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Mendro, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 QC NOTICE: (46 in 8:19-cv-00830-PWG) Amended Complaint filed by Edmund Alves needs to be corrected. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please file the redline version using the event "Notice(Other)" and link to the Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION Regarding Deadline for Filing of Derivative Track Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/3/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION Regarding Deadline for Filing of Derivative Track Second Amended Consolidated Complaint by John P. Moore(O Connell, Andrew)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND ADDRESS Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Schupler on behalf of John P. Moore Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Schupler, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Offenhartz on behalf of Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Bruce Hoffmeister, Stephanie C. Linnartz, Marriott International, Inc., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Frederick A. Henderson, J.W. Marriott, Jr., Marriott International, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., George Munoz, Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Steven S. Reinemund, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Deborah Marriott Harrison, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Aylwin B. Lewis, J.W. Marriott Jr., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Arne M. Sorenson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00368-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Offenhartz, Adam)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura O'Boyle on behalf of Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Marriott International, Inc., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Frederick A. Henderson, Bruce Hoffmeister, J.W. Marriott, Jr., Aylwin B. Lewis, Stephanie C. Linnartz, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., George Munoz, Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Steven S. Reinemund, Arne M. Sorenson, Bao Giang Val Bauduin, Deborah Marriott Harrison, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, J.W. Marriott Jr., Kathleen Kelly Oberg, Arne M. Sorenson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00368-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(O'Boyle, Laura)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Correspondence re: Bellwether Selection Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint ESI Protocol by Gretchen Ehle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Alternative Service by Yisroel MannAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Schlachet, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Donna Hiteshew of Withdrawal of Eve Lynn J. Rapp from Consumer Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address by Katrina Carroll Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Carroll, Katrina)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and FRE(D) and (E) CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Appointing Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Correspondence re: Consolidation Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00812-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(O Connell, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Mary K. Bush waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Bruce W. Duncan waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Deborah M. Harrison waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Frederick A. Henderson waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Eric Hippeau waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Lawrence W. Kellner waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Debra L. Lee waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Aylwin B. Lewis waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. J.W. Marriott, Jr. waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. George Munoz waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Steven S Reinemund waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Susan C. Schwab waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John P. Moore. Arne M. Sorenson waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(McKenna, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of John P. Moore (McKenna, Thomas)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International Inc Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Mendro, Jason)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg on behalf of Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Jacob Mendro on behalf of Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International Inc, J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00830-PWG(Mendro, Jason)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel re: Transfer of MDL case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)(c/e 3/25/2019 with ECF 3 in 8:19md-02879-PWG (Order))
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01776. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 3/25/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/19/2019) (sjo)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (sjo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory M. Egleston. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:78; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Egleston, Gregory)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary K. Bush, Bruce W. Duncan, Deborah M. Harrison, Frederick A. Henderson, Eric Hippeau, Lawrence W. Kellner, Debra L. Lee, Aylwin B. Lewis, Marriott International, Inc., J.W. Marriott, Jr., George Munoz, Steven S. Reinemund, Susan C. Schwab, Arne M. Sorenson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16405570)Document filed by John P. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egleston, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. J.W. Marriott, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary K. Bush
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Inc
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence W. Kellner
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah M. Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra L. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Marriott, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven S Reinemund
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick A. Henderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aylwin B. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Munoz
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arne M. Sorenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hippeau
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce W. Duncan
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Represented By: Adam Offenhartz
Represented By: Laura O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Moore
Represented By: Thomas James McKenna
Represented By: Robert J Schupler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?