Fariss v. Estate of Marina Antonia Cruz, et al
Plaintiff: Mary Orellana Fariss f/k/a Mary H. Papadopoulos and Mary Orellana Fariss
Defendant: Comptroller of Maryland, Estate of Marina Antonia Cruz, Estate of Luz Marina Bermudas Cruz Henao, Everett King, U.S. Internal Revenue Service, Patricia De Bonis, Ronald De Bonis, Lendmark Financial Services LLC, Roseangela V. King and Estate of Alvaro De Jesus Cruz
Respondent: Everett & Rosangela King, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, Marina Antonia Cruz, Estate of, Alvaro De Jesus Cruz, Estate of, Luz Marina Bermudas Cruz Heneo, Estate of, Lendmark Financial Services, LLC and Ronald and Patricia De Bonis
Case Number: 8:2019cv01044
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Remand Notification Letter sent to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland. (cm 04/23/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand; remanding this case to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/23/2019. (c/cm 04/23/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Remand by U.S. Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/15/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 State Court Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland against Comptroller of Maryland, Patricia De Bonis, Ronald De Bonis, Estate of Alvaro De Jesus Cruz, Estate of Luz Marina Bermudas Cruz Henao, Estate of Marina Antonia Cruz, Everett King, Roseangela V. King, Lendmark Financial Services LLC and U.S. Internal Revenue Service, filed by Mary Orellana Fariss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Case Information Report)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Cusson, Evelyn)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 462818-V., filed by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Cusson, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fariss v. Estate of Marina Antonia Cruz, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Everett & Rosangela King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marina Antonia Cruz, Estate of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alvaro De Jesus Cruz, Estate of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luz Marina Bermudas Cruz Heneo, Estate of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lendmark Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald and Patricia De Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Orellana Fariss f/k/a Mary H. Papadopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Orellana Fariss
Represented By: Steven Brian Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comptroller of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Marina Antonia Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Luz Marina Bermudas Cruz Henao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia De Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald De Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendmark Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseangela V. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Alvaro De Jesus Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?