Baumann v. Advanced Technology Services et al

Plaintiff: William Baumann
Defendant: Advanced Technology Services, Aeroquip Corporation, Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc., Eaton Corporation and Eaton Aeroquip LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01049
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monica Detert. Directing attorney Monica Detert to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 23 QC NOTICE: #22 Response in Support of Motion filed by Eaton Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip LLC was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect docketing event was used. The correct event is Reply in Response to Motion located under Responses and Replies. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Corporation.(Wharton, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct title (rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Advanced Technology Services identifying Corporate Parent The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services, Inc., Corporate Parent ATS Global, Inc., Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services Puerto Rico, LLC, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services Mexico S. DE R.L. DE C.V., Corporate Parent Servicios Administrativos Y De Personal ATS S DE RL DE CV, Corporate Parent ATS Mexico, LLC, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services UK, LTD, Corporate Parent ATS China, LLC, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services China, LTD, Corporate Parent Advanced Technology Services Canada, Inc., Corporate Parent ATS Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Harvard Distribution, LLC, Corporate Parent Innovative Technology Solutions, LLC for Advanced Technology Services.(Robertson, Rodger)
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Advanced Technology Services.(Robertson, Rodger)
May 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Monica R. Detert (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7997263.) by Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Corporation(Wharton, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Advanced Technology Services identifying Other Affiliate The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company for Advanced Technology Services.(Robertson, Rodger)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Baumann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Eric)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark A Solheim. Directing attorney Mark A Solheim to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Richard W Bale. Directing attorney Richard W Bale to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.5 Statement Concerning Removal filed by Defendants Eaton Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Advanced Technology Services and Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc. (Wharton, Michael) Modified on 4/12/2019 to expand text and defendants' names (tds, Deputy Clerk).
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark A. Solheim (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7947509.) by Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Corporation(Wharton, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard W. Bale (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7947487.) by Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Corporation(Wharton, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wharton, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by William Baumann (Rosenberg, Eric)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Eaton Aeroquip LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation for Eaton Aeroquip LLC.(Wharton, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation (Wharton, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Omron Management Center of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Omron Adept Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Omron Robotics and Safety Technologies, Inc. for Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc..(Conti, Anthony)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/9/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 - 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Advanced Technology Services, Aeroquip Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc..(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Services, Aeroquip Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc., filed by William Baumann.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Services, Eaton Corporation, Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc. and Eaton Aeroquip LLC filed by William Baumann.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL18-42615. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7938908), filed by Eaton Corporation, Aeroquip Corporation, Advanced Technology Services, Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment)(Wharton, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baumann v. Advanced Technology Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Technology Services
Represented By: Rodger O Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroquip Corporation
Represented By: Michael Thomas Wharton
Represented By: Michael Sweeney Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omron Scientific Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Silvestri
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Michael Thomas Wharton
Represented By: Michael Sweeney Rubin
Represented By: Richard W Bale
Represented By: Monica Detert
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip LLC
Represented By: Michael Thomas Wharton
Represented By: Michael Sweeney Rubin
Represented By: Richard W Bale
Represented By: Monica Detert
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Baumann
Represented By: Eric F Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?