Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company et al v. Presidential Service of DE, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Presidential Service of DE, Inc. a/k/a Blue Shore, Inc., Presidential Service of DE., Inc. and Blue Shore Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01088
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/19/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Presidential Service of DE., Inc. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons re Presidential Service DE (Alexander, Maryan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Alexander, Maryan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE regarding: #1 Complaint, filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. ***The following attachment is missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. Thank you. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Presidential Service of DE, Inc. a/k/a Blue Shore, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7944336.), filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Maryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company et al v. Presidential Service of DE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Maryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Maryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Maryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presidential Service of DE, Inc. a/k/a Blue Shore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presidential Service of DE., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shore Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?