Boger v. Energy Telemarketers Incorporation et al

Plaintiff: Dan Boger
Defendant: National Gas & Electric, LLC and Energy Telemarketers Incorporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01240
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ezra D. Church (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8101957.) by National Gas & Electric, LLC(Harvey, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Gas & Electric, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Spark Energy, Inc. for National Gas & Electric, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC.(Harvey, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant National Gas & Electric, LLC's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Dan Boger by National Gas & Electric, LLC.(Harvey, Patrick)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense , against Energy Telemarketers by Dan Boger (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ring, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/3/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ring, Stephen) Modified on 5/28/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Boger. Energy Telemarketers Incorporation served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019.(Ring, Stephen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew McCue. Directing attorney Matthew McCue to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew P. McCue (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8012353.) by Dan Boger(Ring, Stephen)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Dan Boger to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Dan Boger files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/14/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dan Boger. National Gas & Electric, LLC waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email of May 2, 2016)(Ring, Stephen)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corrected Summons Issued 21 days as to Energy Telemarketers Incorporation, National Gas & Electric, LLC.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/29/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Dan Boger or counsel for Dan Boger are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/13/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Energy Telemarketers Incorporation, National Gas & Electric, LLC.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Dan Boger re #1 Complaint, attaching two corrected summons, (Attachments: #1 Summons corrected)(Ring, Stephen)
April 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , class action, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7979067.), filed by Dan Boger. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Energy Telemarketers, #2 Summons National Gas & Electric, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ring, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boger v. Energy Telemarketers Incorporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Gas & Electric, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Telemarketers Incorporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Boger
Represented By: Stephen Howard Ring
Represented By: Matthew McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?