Clagett v. Zahir
Plaintiff: Corporal Derreck Clagett
Defendant: Naja Talibah Zahir and Zahir El
Case Number: 8:2019cv01252
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of USCA Consolidating case Nos. 19-1517, 19-1518, and 19-1519 as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Naja Talibah Zahir (rss, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Acknowledgment from the District Court for Prince George's County Maryland re #11 Remand Notification Letter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Case Number 19-1517 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Naja Talibah Zahir. Case Manager - Ashley Brownlee (krcs, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #15 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(sp2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 Supplemental to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Naja Talibah Zahir. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/10/2019. (cm 05/10/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order Dismissing Case, by Naja Talibah Zahir. (sp2, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence from Naja Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration (Writ of Error) re #10 Order Remanding Case, by Naja Talibah Zahir.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Remand Notification Letter sent to the District Court for Prince George's County, Maryland. (cm 05/06/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for Emergency Injunction; remanding this case to the District Court for Prince George's County, Maryland. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/3/2019. (cm 05/03/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/3/2019. (cm 05/03/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 Removal Notification Letter (cm 05/01/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/1/2019. (cm 05/01/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Sealed Document(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Sealed Document(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Naja Talibah Zahir.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Emergency Injunction by Naja Talibah Zahir.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Complaint and Application for Statement of Charges against Naja Talibah Zahir, filed by Derreck Clagett.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number 6E00664131., filed by Naja Talibah Zahir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 State Summons, #4 Decree for Change of Name, #5 Arrest Warrant Returned, #6 Continuation of Inital Appearance Report)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clagett v. Zahir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naja Talibah Zahir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahir El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corporal Derreck Clagett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?