Neiswanger Management Services LLC et al v. RSUI Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Mr. Matt Neiswanger, Neiswanger Management Services LLC and Matt Neiswanger
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01288
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Fahey. Directing attorney Jennifer Fahey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Matt Neiswanger, Neiswanger Management Services LLC (Joshi, Cary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer S. Fahey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8076473.) by Matt Neiswanger, Neiswanger Management Services LLC(Joshi, Cary)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Courtney Scott. Directing attorney Courtney Scott to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Courtney E. Scott (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8063203.) by RSUI Indemnity Company(Beall, Patricia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RSUI Indemnity Company.(Beall, Patricia)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within Fourteen (14) days a statement containing the identity and state of citizenship of all member of NWS. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Neiswanger Management Services LLC identifying Other Affiliate Heritage Care, Inc., Other Affiliate NMS Healthcare of Hagerstown, LLC, Other Affiliate New Annapolis Nursing, LLC, Other Affiliate NMS Healthcare of Springbrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Cleatus Health, LLC, Other Affiliate Nancy Moore & Company, LLC, Other Affiliate M&J Hyattsville, LLC, Other Affiliate NMS Healthcare of Hyattsville, LLC, Other Affiliate M&J Hagerstown, LLC, Other Affiliate M&J Annapolis, LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate NMS Wellness, LLC, Other Affiliate NMS Healthcare of Silver Spring, LLC, Other Affiliate NMS Dialysis of Springbrook, LLC, Other Affiliate New Generation Dialysis, LLC, Other Affiliate Neiswanger Foundation, Other Affiliate Golden Springs, LLC for Neiswanger Management Services LLC.(Joshi, Cary)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Neiswanger Management Services LLC was filed incorrectly. **The Corporate Parent and/or Corporate Affiliate(s) were not added. Please re-file the document in accordance with ECF civil procedures published in the Electronic Filing Requirements and Procedures Manual. Instructions can be found on the court's website under E-Filing Procedures, Civil Procedures, and Disclosure of Corporate Interest. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Neiswanger Management Services LLC (Joshi, Cary) Modified on 5/10/2019 (rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to RSUI Indemnity Company.(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Matt Neiswanger, Neiswanger Management Services LLC re #1 Complaint (Joshi, Cary)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/2/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to RSUI Indemnity Company. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Matt Neiswanger, Neiswanger Management Services LLC re #1 Complaint Summons in a Civil Complaint (Joshi, Cary)
May 2, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Neiswanger Management Services LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/9/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Neiswanger Management Services LLC, Matt Neiswanger was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RSUI Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7985626.), filed by Neiswanger Management Services LLC, Matt Neiswanger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joshi, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neiswanger Management Services LLC et al v. RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patricia H Beall
Represented By: Courtney Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Matt Neiswanger
Represented By: Cary L. Joshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neiswanger Management Services LLC
Represented By: Cary L. Joshi
Represented By: Jennifer Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Neiswanger
Represented By: Cary L. Joshi
Represented By: Jennifer Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?