Allstate Insurance Company v. Pentair Water Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Sta-Rite Industries, LLC and Pentair Water Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01350
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT Defendants letter request per ECF No. 22. The Court will rule on the request after receiving the ex parte submissions of the parties under an advanced deadline. The ex parte submissions are now due no later than September 9, 2019. In the event the parties have yet to resolve the issue of the appearance of party representatives, then Defendants shall renew their letter request on that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/24/2019. (Day, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 Correspondence re: Requesting Participation of Corp. Rep. in Settlement Conference by Telephone (Kahn, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/31/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/31/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/31/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER to Counsel regarding referral for all Further Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/31/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER/ORDER scheduling a settlement conference for Tuesday, October 15, 2019 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/31/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 5/21/2019 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kahn, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/21/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/21/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal filed by Pentair Water Group, Inc..(Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 5/10/2019 to remove link to notice of removal (rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 QC NOTICE regarding: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pentair Water Group, Inc. ***The following attachment is missing: Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal. Thank you. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pentair Water Group, Inc. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/9/2019. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Deficiency Notice as to Pentair Water Group, Inc. and Sta-Rite Industries, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statements have not been filed. The Statements must be filed by 5/16/2019. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4 through 9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Sta-Rite Industries, LLC. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 [FILED IN ERROR] THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4 through 8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (tds, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/9/2019 (tds, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Amendment by Interlineation by Allstate Insurance Company re #7 Amended Complaint (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pentair Water Group, Inc., Sta-Rite Industries, LLC, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Pentair Water Group, Inc. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Amendment by Interlineation by Allstate Insurance Company re #4 Complaint (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Pentair Water Group, Inc, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Case Information Report) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 103(5) by Pentair Water Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Answer to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certificate Regarding Discovery, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Notice of New Case Number, #6 Exhibit Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit Amendment by Interlineation, #9 Exhibit Motion for Postponement, #10 Exhibit Order, #11 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #12 Exhibit Certificate Regarding Discovery, #13 Exhibit Notice of Pending Events, #14 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #15 Exhibit Motion to Substitute Defendant, #16 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit Line Striking Motion to Substitute, #18 Exhibit Amendment by Interlineation)(Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 5/9/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pentair Water Group, Inc. and Sta-Rite Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 5/9/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 458662-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8000100), filed by Pentair Water Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Lanier, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Pentair Water Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sta-Rite Industries, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Lanier
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Water Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Lanier
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles J Fratus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?