FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS v. Doyle et al
Plaintiff: FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS
Defendant: United States, Montgomery County, Maryland and Joseph G. Doyle
Case Number: 8:2019cv01365
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (9-30) ARE COPIES OF PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Affidavit of Service on Summons as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Affidavit of Service on Summons as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Summons for Redemption Issued as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Undeliverable Mail Returned as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Line Reissue Summons as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Amended Complaint as filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Order granting Motion to Vacate Judgment Foreclosing Right of Redemption as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Motion to Vacate Judgment Foreclosing Right of Redemption as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Undeliverable Mail Returned as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Judgment Foreclosing Right of Redemption as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Affidavit of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Summons for Redemption Issued as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Line Reissue Summons as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Affidavit of Service on Summons as to Joseph Doyle as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Summons for Redemption Issued as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Line Reissue Summons as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Sheriff's Return on Posting Order as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Return of Service on Montgomery County, Maryland as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Summons for Redemption issued as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Notice to Interested Parties of Action to Foreclose the Right of Redemption in Property Sold at Tax Sale as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Notice of New Case Number as filed in State Court (White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States re #8 Local Rule Complaint to Foreclose Rights of Redemption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(White, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers(White, Neil)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by United States.(White, Neil)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/9/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Joseph G. Doyle, Montgomery County, Maryland, and United States, filed by FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Joseph G. Doyle, Montgomery County, Maryland, and United States, filed by FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 - Filing of State Court Papers(White, Neil)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 441704-V., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Summons as filed in State Court, #4 Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder Pursuant to Rule 2-211 as filed in State Court, #5 Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #6 Amended Complaint Ex A as filed in State Court, #7 Affidavit as filed in State Court, #8 Affidavit Ex A as filed in State Court, #9 Affidavit Ex B as filed in State Court, #10 Affidavit Ex B attachment as filed in State Court, #11 Order of Publication as filed in State Court, #12 Notice to Interested Parties of Action to Foreclose the Right of Redemption in Property Sold at Tax Sale as filed in State Court)(White, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS v. Doyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Neil R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FNA DZ, LLC FBO WSFS
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?