Neal v. Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Neal
Defendant: Xia Cai, Bobby F. Cheung, Does 1-10 inclusive and Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01367
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by James Neal (Ubom, Uduak)
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. for Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc..(Daily, Frank)
July 1, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/8/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. or counsel for Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/15/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Quash Improper Service of Process by Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Daily, Frank)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Neal. Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. served on 5/23/19, answer due 6/13/19. Bobby F. Cheung served on 5/23/19, answer due 6/13/19. Xia Cai served on 5/23/19, answer due 6/13/19 (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 7/1/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/4/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing James Neal to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if James Neal files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/28/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued 21 days as to Xia Cai. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by James Neal re #1 Complaint Summuns Xia Cai (Ubom, Uduak)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Notice (Other) filed by James Neal was filed incorrectly. **The following attachment is missing - Proposed Summons for Xia Cai. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons for Xia Cai using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons for Xia Cai to #1 Complaint. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bobby F. Cheung and Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by James Neal re #1 Complaint Summons (Ubom, Uduak)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Clerk to provide copy of this Order to Counsel who shall effectuate service of the summons and Complaint on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/13/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Notice (Other) filed by James Neal was filed incorrectly. **Proposed Summons is incomplete. Please re-file completed Proposed Summons using the Event Notice (Other) and link to #1 Complaint. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by James Neal re #1 Complaint Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 5/13/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/9/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. James Neal or counsel for James Neal are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/23/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by James Neal was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Neal (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xia Cai, Bobby F. Cheung, Does 1-10 inclusive, and Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc., filed by James Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xia Cai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby F. Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Star Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Frank F Daily, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Neal
Represented By: Uduak J Ubom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?