Ventura Martinez et al v. Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arely Mejia, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez, Norberto Herrera, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Rene Ventura Martinez, Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Steve Garcia and Lesme Lemus
Defendant: Damien LeTyrant, Damien Le Tyrant, Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC and Loic Feillet
Case Number: 8:2019cv01373
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/3/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
June 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Steve Garcia, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Arely Mejia, Rene Ventura Martinez (Zelikovitz, Justin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Loic Feillet, Damien LeTyrant and Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8004104.), filed by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Arely Mejia, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Steve Garcia, Rene Ventura Martinez, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventura Martinez et al v. Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien LeTyrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Le Tyrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loic Feillet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arely Mejia
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Hernandez Gonzalez
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Herrera
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Martinez Ventura
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Ventura Martinez
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alfredo Herrera
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Arciniega
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Garcia
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesme Lemus
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?