Watson v. Suntrust Bank
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Watson
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Case Number: 8:2019cv01419
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days to provide a service copy of the Complaint; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/8/2019. (c/m 7/8/19 nu, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Lee Watson.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Curtis Lee Watson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within Twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit to the Clerk a completed civil cover sheet, a service copy of the Complaint, a summons, and either the filing fee or an Affidavit and Motion in support of leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/16/2019. (c/m 5/16/2019 as directed heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Correspondence from Curtis Watson re: Request for IFP Form and U.S. Marshals Summons (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Suntrust Bank, filed by Curtis Lee Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Suntrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?