Butler v. Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital

Plaintiff: George Butler
Defendant: Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital
Case Number: 8:2019cv01425
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital.(Paltell, J)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by George Butler.(Abdullah, Raouf)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Motion to Dismiss (until June 17, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/12/2019. (rass, Chambers)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by George Butler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abdullah, Raouf)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital.(Paltell, J)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF MOTIONS HEARING and advising counsel/parties of record that argument on #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be heard before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Monday, August 12, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Courtroom To Be Determined). (The hearing could also include any other ripe and/or pending motions as of that date.) The parties will be allotted one and one-half (1 1/2) hours for total argument. Counsel should advise in writing immediately if they expect oral argument to exceed the allotted time frame. PLEASE NOTE, however, that certain motions may be decided on the pleadings before the date scheduled for argument. If so, the parties will be notified sufficiently in advance of that date. PLEASE ALSO NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (rass, Chambers)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Ex. 1 - EEOC Charge No. 531-2018-00542, #3 Ex. 2 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #4 Request for Hearing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Paltell, J)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital identifying Other Affiliate Sinai Hospital of Baltimore, Inc., Other Affiliate Northwest Hospital Center, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll Hospital Center, Inc., Other Affiliate The Baltimore Jewish Health Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Children's Hospital at Sinai Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Children's Hospital of Baltimore City, Inc., Other Affiliate The Baltimore Jewish Eldercare Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Insurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Anesthesia Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Community Physicians, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinai Clinical Professionals, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Cardiology at Quarry Lake, LLC, Other Affiliate Courtland Gardens Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Cardiology of Carroll County, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Suburban Physician Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Woodholme Cardiology, LLC, Other Affiliate BW Primary Care, LLC, Other Affiliate The Center for Urologic Specialties, LLC, Other Affiliate General Surgery Specialists, LLC, Other Affiliate Healthstar Medical Services, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Community Practices, LLC, Other Affiliate Practice Dynamics, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinai Eldersburg Real Estate, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll County Health Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Carroll Hospital Center Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll Hospice, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll Hospice, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll Regional Cancer Center Physicians, LLC, Other Affiliate Cardiovascular Associates of Maryland, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Community Gastroenterology, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Community Pediatrics, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Community Pulmonology, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Metropolitan Physician Group, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Metropolitan Staffing, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Potomac Professionals, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Primary Care of Eldersburg, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Primary Care of North Carroll, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Suburban Staffing, LLC, Other Affiliate 8600 Liberty Road, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Cardiology of Parkville, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Gynecology of Pikesville, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Health ACO, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Medical Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll ACO, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll Billing Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll County CMO, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll County Med-Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Carroll Health Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll Health Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll Hospital Center MOB Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll PHO, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll Urgent Care, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Cardiology of Westminster, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Health Cardiology of Baltimore, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Multi-Specialty, LLC, Other Affiliate Med-Services Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeBridge Health and Fitness, LLC, Other Affiliate Acute Diagnostics and Services, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate Advanced Health Collaborative II, LLC (25%), Other Affiliate Advanced Health Collaborative, LLC (20%), Other Affiliate Age Wave Management, LLC (75% of Member), Other Affiliate Age Wave Properties, LLC (75% of Member), Other Affiliate Baltimore County Radiology, LLC (25%), Other Affiliate Carroll Care Pharmacies, LLC (49%), Other Affiliate Carroll County Dialysis Facility Limited Partnership (33%), Other Affiliate Carroll County Digestive Disease Center, LLC (10%), Other Affiliate Carroll County General Hospital South Carroll Medical Center Condominium, Inc. (70%), Other Affiliate Carroll County Radiology, LLC (60%), Other Affiliate Carroll County Sleep Disorder Services, LLC (33%), Other Affiliate Carroll Medical Office Associates, LLC (45%), Other Affiliate Carroll Metropolitan Physician Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Carroll Occupational Health, LLC (75%), Other Affiliate Courtland, LLC (49%), Other Affiliate Ellicott City Ambulatory Surgery Center, L.L.L.P. (51% of GP), Other Affiliate Ellicott City ASC Holdings, L.L.C. (51% of single member), Other Affiliate Ellicott City ASC Management, L.L.C. (51%), Other Affiliate Evergreen Health, Inc., Other Affiliate FCOC, LLC (40%), Other Affiliate Greenspring Office One, LLC (10%), Other Affiliate LBH Evergreen Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge 23 Crossroads Drive Medical Office Building, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Atlantic Medical, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Lab Management, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Metropolitan Physician Group II, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Neurosciences, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Rehabilitation Services, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate LifeBridge Suburban Physician Group II, LLC, Other Affiliate Lochearn Nursing Home, LLC (10%), Other Affiliate MNR Industries, LLC (40%), Other Affiliate Mount Airy Med-Services, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate Mt. Airy Health Services, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate Mt. Airy Plaza, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate National Respiratory Care, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate PLMD, LLC (25%), Other Affiliate Post Acute Physician Partners, LLC (50%), Other Affiliate Sinai Parking Facility, LLC, Other Affiliate Springwell Partners, LLC (75%), Other Affiliate Springwell, LLC (75% of Member), Other Affiliate SurgiCenter of Baltimore, LLC (64%), Other Affiliate Windrush Behavioral Health, LLC (20%), Other Affiliate Homecare Maryland, LLC (51%), Other Affiliate Brinton Woods Health Care Center, LLC (55%), Other Affiliate Brinton Woods Senior Living, LLC (55%), Other Affiliate Cherrywood Limited Partnership (25%), Other Affiliate LBH Carroll County Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Health Clinically Integrated Network, LLC, Other Affiliate LifeBridge Health Israel Ltd., Other Affiliate Northwest Baltimore Radiation Therapy Regional Center, LLC (10%) for Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital.(Paltell, J)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/15/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/22/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital, filed by George Butler. (Attachments: #1 Redline Version) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital, filed by George Butler. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander P Berg on behalf of Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital (Berg, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 459473-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8013971), filed by Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Ex. 2 - Right to Sue Notice, #3 Ex. 3 - First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #1 - Complaint, #5 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #1 - Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #6 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #1 - Letter from EEOC, #7 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #2 - Letter Requesting Information Sheet from Plaintiff, #8 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #3 - Scheduling Notice and Order of Circuit Court, #9 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #4 - Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference and Pretrial Hearing, #10 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #5 - Scheduling Order, #11 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #6 - Notice of New Case Number, #12 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #7 - Summons, #13 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #8 - Plaintiff's Change of Address Form, #14 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #9 - Plaintiff's Request to Reissue Summons, #15 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #10 - Reissued Summons, #16 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #11 - Affidavit of Service of Summons on Sarah Crist, #17 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #12 - QC Notice, #18 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #13 - Motion for Order of Default and Default Judgment, #19 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #14 - Administrative Judge's Notice re Motion for Order of Default, #20 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #15 - Notice of Existing Schedule to Plaintiff's Counsel, #21 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #16 - Request to Withdraw Motion for Default Judgment, #22 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #17 - Plaintiff's Line to Reissue Summons, #23 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #18 - Reissued Summons, #24 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #19 - Affidavit of Service, #25 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #20 - Case Information Report, #26 Ex. 4 - Docket Entry #21 - First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #27 Ex. 5 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal - Circuit Court, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paltell, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Butler
Represented By: Raouf Muhammad Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levindale Hebrew Geriatric Center and Hospital
Represented By: Alexander P Berg
Represented By: J Eric Paltell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?