Mokhtarian v. Fasci et al
Plaintiff: Sheyda Mokhtarian
Defendant: Daniel Fasci, U.S. Dept. of the Navy and United States Department of the Navy
Case Number: 8:2019cv01542
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. Daniel Fasci served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. United States Department of the Navy served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/3/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Sheyda Mokhtarian or counsel for Sheyda Mokhtarian are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Daniel Fasci, United States Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheyda Mokhtarian (Hansel, Cary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8031776.), filed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fasci Summons, #3 Summons US Navy Summons)(Hansel, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mokhtarian v. Fasci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheyda Mokhtarian
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fasci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?