Standard Insurance Company v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Mario M Dunn and Palestina S Dunn
Case Number: 8:2019cv01565
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacqueline Herring. Directing attorney Jacqueline Herring to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Standard Insurance Company Notice of Invocation of Waiver of Service of Summons Under Fed.R. Civ. P. 4(d) (Trager, Scott)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds and for Interpleader Discharge by Standard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Trager, Scott)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company (Trager, Scott)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacqueline J. Herring (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8038612.) by Standard Insurance Company(Trager, Scott)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mario M Dunn, Palestina S Dunn.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Mario M. Dunn, Palestina S. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8036858.), filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Trager, Scott) Modified on 5/29/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurance Company v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario M Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestina S Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Michael Trager
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?