Kokou v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Azianbidgi Kokou and Kokou Azianbidji
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv01639
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DISMISSING the Complaint without prejudice; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/11/2019. (c/m 7/12/19 nu, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kokou Azianbidji (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to Amend the docket; directing Plaintiff to file the $400.00 filing fee or file indigency motion within 21 days. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/21/2019. (c/m/w-forms 6/24/19 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/17/2019. (c/m 6/17/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Motion for return of seized property) against United States of America, filed by Azianbidgi Kokou. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kokou v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azianbidgi Kokou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kokou Azianbidji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?