Montgomery v. Pohanka Imports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeanette Montgomery
Defendant: Pohanka Imports, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01707
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Pohanka Imports, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence re: Reissue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Holzman, Lawrence)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Pohanka Imports, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Reissue of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Holzman, Lawrence)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pohanka Imports, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8065319.), filed by Jeanette Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Holzman, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Pohanka Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pohanka Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Montgomery
Represented By: Lawrence Roger Holzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?