Ballou v. Commissioner , Social Security Administration (SSA)
Plaintiff: Letavia D. Ballou
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration (SSA)
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2019cv01708
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/10/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Beiser, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration (SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security Administration (SSA) (heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/19/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration (SSA) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8065641.), filed by Letavia D. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Beiser, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballou v. Commissioner , Social Security Administration (SSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration (SSA)
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letavia D. Ballou
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?