Kiplangat v. Kegege
Plaintiff: Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat
Defendant: Obadiah Oseko Kegege
Case Number: 8:2019cv01724
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT on Dismissal of State Court Custody Case by Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Docket)(Hauser, Leah)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing the status of dismissal of the custody case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/11/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat re #8 Order Preliminary Notice of Return of Child to Canada (Hauser, Leah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt for Return of Passport.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 -SEALED - Exhibit A to Voluntary Return Order re #8 Order (cs3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VOLUNTARY RETURN ORDER, Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/17/2019. (cs3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Show Cause Hearing held on 6/17/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins - 2B) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/17/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Obadiah Oseko Kegege served on 6/13/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Pretrial Order submitted by Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Hauser, Leah)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER; Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2B, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM Form/USM Stamped) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings Pursuant to Hague Convention Law by Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Show Cause Order)(Hauser, Leah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Return of Child to Canada against Obadiah Oseko Kegege ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8067860.), filed by Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Show Cause Order)(Hauser, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiplangat v. Kegege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obadiah Oseko Kegege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelly Chepwogen Kiplangat
Represented By: Kelly A Powers
Represented By: Stephen John Cullen
Represented By: Leah Marie Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?