City of Cambridge, Maryland v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Cambridge, Maryland
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, CVS Health, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1 - 100 inclusive, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, SpecGx LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Kroger Co., Kroger Company and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01737
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for Northern Ohio 7/3/19 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/3/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew R McCarley. Directing attorney Matthew R McCarley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for MATTHEW R MCCARLEY by City of Cambridge, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Attachment hand-written signature). The fee has already been paid.(Novak, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1 - 100 inclusive, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Company, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for MATTHEW R MCCARLEY (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8081119.) by City of Cambridge, Maryland(Novak, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re #6 Amended Complaint Redline version (Novak, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Amended Complaint filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland needs to be corrected. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please file the redline version using Notice (Other) and link to #6 Amended Complaint (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Novak, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #3 Notice and #4 Notice filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland was filed incorrectly. ** Pursuant to Local Rule 103.2(a) In Cases subject to electronic filing, counsel shall submit to the Clerk the following number of copies when process is to be served; (a) One(1) copy of any summons for EACH party to be served. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Case re to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re #1 Complaint & SUMMONS (cured) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Novak, Jonathan)
June 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re #1 Complaint & SUMMONS (cured) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Novak, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachment is missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8070780.), filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Novak, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Cambridge, Maryland v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cambridge, Maryland
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Novak
Represented By: Matthew R McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?