Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 8:2019cv01776
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/11/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #2 Exhibit A, Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B, Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C, Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramos Velasquez, Elsy)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/18/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (c/m 6/18/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Inability to Confer (Ramos Velasquez, Elsy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Ramos Velasquez, Elsy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8076850.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos Velasquez, Elsy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Elsy Marleni Ramos Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?