Hodge v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Appellant: Debra Kaye Hodge
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Case Number: 8:2019cv01877
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/5/2019. (c/m 8/5/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/5/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that within Ten (10) days of the date of this Order Appellant must submit the designation of record and Statement to the Court, also a statement explaining her delay in filing those documents. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/19/2019. (c/m 7/19/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 Docket Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Attachments: #1 BK # 81 Order Denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/25/2019. (c/m 6/25/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (c/m 6/25/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 18-23587, filed by Debra Kaye Hodge. Appellant Brief due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Debra Kaye Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Paul J Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?