Lindauer v. U.S. Bank National Association
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Appellant: Susan Lindauer
Trustee: Nancy Spencer Grigsby
Case Number: 8:2019cv01887
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Loomba, Namrata)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Briefs filed by Susan Lindauer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for extension)(McKnight, Thomas) Modified on 7/31/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Letter to Counsel regarding briefs. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's Designation of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 BK #1 Chapter 13 Petition, #2 BK #4 Chapter 13 Plan, #3 BK #5 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules, #4 BK #6 Statement of Current Monthly Income, #5 BK #18 Amended Schedules, #6 BK #19 Amended Schedules, #7 BK #23 Amended Schedules, #8 BK #30 Notice of Mortgage Payment Change, #9 BK #30-1 Exhibit, #10 BK #31 Amended Verification of Creditor Matrix, #11 BK #35 Motion to Continue Confirmation Hearing, #12 BK #45 Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #13 BK #50 Proceeding Memo for Hearing held 4/23/2019, #14 BK #53 Response to Debtor's Objection to Claim No. 1, #15 BK #53-1 Exhibit A, #16 BK #53-2 Exhibit B, #17 BK #53-3 Exhibit C, #18 BK #53-4 Proposed Order, #19 BK #57 Reply to Response to Objection to Claim No. 1, #20 BK 57-1 Exhibit A, #21 BK 57-2 Exhibit B, #22 BK #57-3 Exhibit, #23 BK #57-4 Exhibit, #24 BK #66 Order Overruling Objection to Claim No. 1, #25 Docket Sheet, #26 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Namrata Loomba on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Loomba, Namrata)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (c/m 6/26/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11861, filed by Susan Lindauer. Appellant Brief due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindauer v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Namrata Loomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan Lindauer
Represented By: Thomas Kerns McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nancy Spencer Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?