Monroe-Ricks et. al v. Social Security Administration et. al.
Plaintiff: Vicky Monroe-Ricks and R. Monroe
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Disability Determination Services
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2019cv01959
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (FILED IN CLERK'S ERROR) ORDER that within Twenty-One (21) days of the date of this Order plaintiff will file supplemental documentation regarding the incompetence of Ronald M. to file a lawsuit on his own name. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/22/2019. (c/m 8/22/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/22/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 21 days to file supplemental documentation regarding the incompetence of Ronald M. and documentation that she has been granted power of attorney by Ronald M. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/16/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 8/19/19)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order Regarding supplemental filed by Vicky Monroe-Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 21 days to file a Supplemental regarding competency/incompetency of Ronald M. and her Authority for asserting power of attorney. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/24/2019. (cm 7/24/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (cm 7/10/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Social Security Administration. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Permanent Preliminary Injunctive Relief) against Social Security Administration, filed by Vicky Monroe-Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/3/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe-Ricks et. al v. Social Security Administration et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Monroe-Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Determination Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?