McClain v. Branigan et al
Appellant: Iris McClain
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Trustee: The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 8:2019cv01978
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Appellant's Brief by Iris McClain (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Brief, #2 Appendix to Proposed Amended Brief)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Appellee's BRIEF by The Bank of New York Mellon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Meyer, Sarah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Letter to Parties re Briefs (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 8/12/19)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Appellant's BRIEF by Iris McClain. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPELLEES' DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by The Bank of New York Mellon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 BK #1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, #2 BK #1-1 Notice of Deadline, #3 BK #14 Schedules A-J, #4 BK #14-1 List of All Creditors, #5 BK #15 Summary of Assets and Liabilities, #6 BK #15-1 List of All Creditors, #7 BK #16 Statement of Financial Affairs, #8 BK #16-1 List of All Creditors, #9 BK #17 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income, #10 BK #17-1 List of All Creditors, #11 BK #18 Chapter 13 Plan, #12 BK #18-1 List of All Creditors, #13 BK #22 Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #14 BK #23 Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #15 BK #24 Order Denying Confirmation of Plan with Leave to Amend, #16 BK #28 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #17 BK #28-1 List of All Creditors, #18 BK #29 Order Denying Confirmation with Leave to Amend, #19 BK #31 Emergency Response to Order Denying Confirmation, #20 BK #35 Order Granting Extension of Time to File Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #21 BK #40 Correspondence from Debtor, #22 BK #41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #23 BK #41-1 Proposed Order, #24 BK #41-2 List of All Creditors, #25 BK #42 Order Striking Appearance of Edward C. Christman, Jr. as Counsel for Debtor, #26 BK #44 Proceeding Memo for Hearing held 5/2/2017, #27 BK #47 Motion to Induce Mr. Christman to Perform or Dismiss the Order Striking Appearance, #28 BK #49 Motion to Prosecute for Misconduct, #29 BK #50 Response to Motion to Prosecute for Misconduct, #30 BK #50-1 Exhibit, #31 BK #50-2 Exhibitbb, #32 BK #50-3 Exhibit, #33 BK #53 Order Denying Motion to Induce Mr. Christman to Perform or Dismiss, #34 BK #54 Order Denying Motion to Prosecute, #35 BK #62 Response to Response to Motion to Disallow Claims, #36 BK #64 Amended Response to Response to Motion to Disallow Claims, #37 BK #65 Debtor's Response Regarding Hearing Scheduled for September 26, 2017, #38 BK #66 Motion for Relief from Stay and an Equitable Servitude as to Real Property, #39 BK #66-1 Notice of Motion, #40 BK #66-2 Exhibits A-C, #41 BK #68 Motion to Reconsider, #42 BK #72 Order Denying Motion to Disallow Claims, #43 BK #74 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #44 BK #77 Urgent Motion to Reconsider, #45 BK #78 Response to Motion for Relief from Stay and for an Equitable Servitude as to Real Property, #46 BK #79 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #47 BK #80-2 Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #48 BK #80-3 Notice of Motion, #49 BK #84 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #50 BK #85 Notice of Reinstated Hearing, #51 BK #89 Motion for Contempt of Violation of Automatic Stay, #52 BK #90 Notice of Appeal re Order Denying Motion to Disallow Claims, #53 BK #91 Response to Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Case, #54 BK #93 Notice of Filing of Appeal to the USDC, #55 BK #97 Order Granting Motion for Relief from Stay and an Equitable Servitude as to Real Property, #56 BK #100 Opposition to Motion for Contempt, #57 BK #101 Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay Pending Appeal, #58 BK #104 Order Striking Pleading for Failure to Comply with Required Filing Procedures, #59 BK #105 Order Denying Motion for Contempt of Violation of Automatic Stay, #60 BK #107 Order Denying Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #61 BK #108 Motion to Vacate Order Granting Motion for Relief from Stay, #62 BK #115 Response to Order Denying Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #63 BK #118 Order Denying Motion to Vacate, #64 BK #120 Transcript of Hearing held 10/17/2017, #65 BK #120-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #66 BK #121 Transcript of Hearing held 11/13/2017, #67 BK #121-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #68 BK #127 Final Order by District Judge Theodore D. Chuang re Appeal in Civil Action No. 8:17-3397, #69 BK #128 Motion to Request this Honorable Appeal Court Vacate Order, Doc 22, dated April 30, 2018, #70 BK #130 Motion to Strike/Vacate Order, #71 BK #131 Order Denying Motion to Strike/Vacate Order, #72 BK #133 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report, #73 BK #134 Motion to Extend Time to File the Notice of Intent to Appeal, #74 BK #135 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Notice of Intent to Appeal, #75 BK #137 Notice of Appeal, #76 BK #138 Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal to USDC, #77 BK #141 Copy of Informal Briefing filed with USCA case number 18-2309, #78 BK #143 Copy of Informal Briefing Order filed with USCA case number 18-2309, #79 BK #150 Judgment of USCA affirming the Judgment of the District Court as to USCA case number 18-2510, #80 BK #151 Mandate as to USCA case number 18-2510, #81 BK #152 Final Memorandum Order by District Judge Theodore D. Chuang re Appeal in Civil Action No. 8:18-3692, #82 BK #153 Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Case, #83 BK #155 Notice of Appeal and Motion to Recuse, #84 BK #156 Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal to USDC, #85 BK #157 Initial Transmittal to USDC, #86 BK #157-1 Order Being Appealed, #87 BK #157-2 Docket Sheet, #88 BK #157-3 Transmittal Sheet, #89 BK #158 Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal to USDC, #90 BK #159 Amended Initial Transmittal to USDC, #91 BK #159-1 Order Being Appealed, #92 BK #159-2 Docket Sheet, #93 BK #159-3 Transmittal Sheet, #94 BK #160 Order re Motion to Recuse, #95 BK #164 Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal to the USDC, #96 BK #165 Appellant Designation of Record, #97 Docket Sheet, #98 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Iris McClain re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; Appellant Brief due by 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 BK #153 Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Case, #2 BK #155 Notice of Appeal, #3 BK #156 Notice of Filing of Appeal to the USDC, #4 BK #157 Initial Transmittal to USDC, #5 BK #157-1 Order Being Appealed, #6 BK #157-2 Docket Sheet, #7 BK #157-3 Transmittal Sheet, #8 BK #158 Amended Notice of Filing of Appeal to the USDC, #9 BK #160 Order re Motion to Recuse, #10 BK #48 Motion to Disallow Claims, #11 BK #51 Proceeding Memo for Hearing held 5/23/2017, #12 BK #58 Response to Motion to Disallow Claims, #13 BK #58-1 Exhibit Loan Mod, #14 BK #72 Order Denying Motion to Disallow Claims, #15 BK #76 Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Case Upon Failure to Amend, #16 BK #76-1 Notice of Dismissal, #17 BK #79 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #18 BK #89 Motion for Contempt of Violation of Automatic Stay, #19 Docket Sheet, #20 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Meyer on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Meyer, Sarah)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Wood Barnhart on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Notification Letter from Clerk sent to Pro-Se Plaintiff (c/m 7/19/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Transmittal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Iris McClain. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 16-22179,, filed by Iris McClain. Appellant Brief due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain v. Branigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Iris McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Virginia Wood Barnhart
Represented By: Sarah E Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Virginia Wood Barnhart
Represented By: Sarah E Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?