Johnson v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Plaintiff: Carlos Johnson
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01996
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Carlos Johnson must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Chambers, Darrell) Modified on 7/22/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 7/9/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Carlos Johnson or counsel for Carlos Johnson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/23/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Carlos Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8111166.), filed by Carlos Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chambers, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Johnson
Represented By: Darrell Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?