James v. Washington Metro Area Transit Authority, et al
Plaintiff: JAMES OLIVER and Oliver James, Jr.
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, GREENPARK CORPORATION and Greenbelt Road Shell
Case Number: 8:2019cv02032
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Greenbelt Road Shell, Greenpark Corporation re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Friedman, Sanford)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Phucas, Nicholas)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 CROSSCLAIM filed in the District Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Greenpark Corporation.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed in the District Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against Greenbelt Road Shell, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Oliver James, Jr.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #6 Cross Claim, by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim)(Phucas, Nicholas) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Phucas, Nicholas) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Phucas, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County District Court, case number 050200162872019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8116216), filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Previous Filings Notice, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint, #5 Greenpark Cross Claim, #6 Notice of Filing of Removal_state court)(Phucas, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Washington Metro Area Transit Authority, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: Nicholas L Phucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENPARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbelt Road Shell
Represented By: Sanford Alex Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver James, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Alan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?