Jane Doe #2 v. Charles County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe/John Doe #2 and Jane Doe #2
Defendant: Kenneth Schroeck, Board of Education of Charles County, Carlos D. Bell and Charles County Board of Education
Case Number: 8:2019cv02050
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 60 PAPERLESS NOTICE: The Rule 16 conference call set for October 13, 2020 is CANCELLED. (tb2s, Chambers)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Carlos Bell. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/13/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
October 13, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Doe #2 (Bryant, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 57 PAPERLESS NOTICE: A recorded call has been scheduled for October 13, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Instructions will be emailed to the Parties. (tb2s, Chambers)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #55 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Charles County Board of Education and Kenneth Schroeck. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/30/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
September 30, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(O Meally, Edmund)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Megan Aileen Benevento terminated. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/27/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jane Doe #2(Benevento, Megan)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/23/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2020 Filing 51 LINE re #50 Answer to Complaint by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew) Modified on 6/4/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2020 Filing 50 -SEALED-SEALED ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck.(Scott, Andrew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #47 Modified Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/31/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
March 23, 2020 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Other Relief JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Paula Xinis.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/10/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #42 Consent Motion for Court's February 24, 2020 Memorandum Opinion to Remain Under Seal for the reasons stated on the recorded conference call. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/10/2020. (bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 44 Telephone Conference held on 3/10/2020 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Ulander - 2C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER scheduling recorded conference for March 10, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/4/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/4/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
March 2, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Seal CONSENT MOTION FOR COURT'S FEBRUARY 24, 2020 MEMORANDUM OPINION TO REMAIN UNDER SEAL by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 -SEALED-ORDER granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/24/2020. (c/em 2/24/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 24, 2020 Filing 40 -SEALED-MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/24/2020. (c/em 2/24/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/3/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
August 29, 2019 Filing 37 -SEALED-RESPONSE re #30 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Scott, Andrew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment and all Related Exhibits Under Seal by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Seal; granting #31 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/19/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/19/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jane Doe #2(Prawde, Alyse)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Seal by Jane Doe #2(Prawde, Alyse)
August 16, 2019 Filing 30 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM and Supporting Exhibits filed by Jane Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45)(Prawde, Alyse)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff's Response to #20 MOTION to Dismiss is due on or before August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/12/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 Sealed Document(Scott, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 Sealed Document(Scott, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 Sealed Document(Scott, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Certain Portions of State Court File Under Seal by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71)(Scott, Andrew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by Jane Doe #2 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to File Partial Answer and Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment and All Related Exhibits Under Seal; GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/24/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM and Supporting Exhibits, #18 Answer to Complaint LINE INFORMING COURT OF SERVICE OF FILINGS UNDER SEAL by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew) Modified on 7/22/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 -SEALED- MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM and Supporting Exhibits by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1 Schroeck Deposition, #4 Exhibit 2 Rooney Deposition, #5 Exhibit 3 Prince Deposition, #6 Exhibit 4 Coyne Deposition, #7 Exhibit 5 Cardamone Deposition, #8 Exhibit 6 Kolbe Deposition, #9 Exhibit 7 Harvard-Lamb Deposition, #10 Exhibit 8 Budd Deposition, #11 Exhibit 9 Belfeld Deposition, #12 Exhibit 10 Hill Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 11 Higgs Affidavit)(Scott, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 -SEALED- ANSWER to #3 AMENDED Complaint PARTIAL ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck.(Scott, Andrew) Modified on 7/19/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Partial Answer and Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) (12-16) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CHARLES COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 STATE COURT Complaint by Charles County Board of Education.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 PARTIAL ANSWER to #12 STATE COURT Complaint by Charles County Board of Education.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT WRIT OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe #2. Carlos D. Bell served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT Writ of Summons Issued 30 days as to Carlos D. Bell, Charles County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/16/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Carlos D. Bell, Charles County Board of Education, Kenneth Schroeck, filed by Jane Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 State Court Civil Case Information Report)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyse Lauren Prawde on behalf of Jane Doe/John Doe #2 (Prawde, Alyse)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Aileen Benevento on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Benevento, Megan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Bryant on behalf of Jane Doe/John Doe #2 (Bryant, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck identifying Corporate Parent Maryland Association of Boards of Education Group Insurance Pool for Board of Education of Charles County.(Scott, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kambon Raymond Williams on behalf of Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck (Williams, Kambon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J O Meally on behalf of Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck (O Meally, Edmund)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, LINE RE CORRECTIONS TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Scott, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Scott, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 -SEALED - AMENDED COMPLAINT of Filing Under Seal State Court - First Amended Complaint & Jury Demand by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, (Scott, Andrew) Modified on 7/16/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Motion to File Exhibit to Notice of Removal Under Seal by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck(Scott, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charles County, case number C-08-CV-18-000137. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8120414), filed by Board of Education of Charles County, Kenneth Schroeck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 3 State Court Summons Issued to Board of Education, #5 Exhibit 4 State Court Summons Issued to C. Bell, #6 Exhibit 5 State Court Sheriff's Return, #7 Exhibit 6 State Court Board's Partial Answer to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 State Court Order Granting Extension to File Opposition, #9 Exhibit 8 State Court Order-Board's Response to Partial Motion to Dismiss Deadline, #10 Exhibit 9 State Court Order re Confidentiality of Discovery Material, #11 Exhibit 10 State Court Order Granting Board's Partial MTD as to Counts II, IV, V, VI, #12 Exhibit 11 State Court Board's Answer to Complaint, #13 Exhibit 12 State Court Order for Alternative Dispute Resolution Conferences, #14 Exhibit 13 Stat e Court Order for Production of Records, #15 Exhibit 14 State Court re Completion of ADR Conference, #16 Exhibit 15 State Court Order to Strike Attorney Appearance, #17 Exhibit 16 State Court Order Granting Joint Motion for Reconsideration, #18 Exhibit 17 State Court Order Compelling Charles Co. Sherriff_s Office to Produce Records, #19 Exhibit 18 State Court Order Granting Motion to Seal, #20 Exhibit 19 PLACE HOLDER State Court First Amended Complaint., #21 Exhibit 20 State Court Summons Issued to Schroeck., #22 Exhibit 21 Order First Amended Complaint Sealed Document)(Scott, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe #2 v. Charles County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Schroeck
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Charles County
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles County Board of Education
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe/John Doe #2
Represented By: Megan Aileen Benevento
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #2
Represented By: Megan Aileen Benevento
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?