Choice Hotels International, Inc. v. Rosenfeld
Plaintiff: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Defendant: Fred M. Rosendfeld and Fred M. Rosenfeld
Case Number: 8:2019cv02125
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. Fred M. Rosenfeld served on 8/25/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Defendant Fred M. Rosenfeld)(Berge, Zachary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fred M. Rosendfeld, filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint, Redline Version)(Berge, Zachary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Choice Hotels International, Inc. or Counsel for Choice Hotels International, Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/19/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Choice Hotels International, Inc. or counsel for Choice Hotels International, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/2/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Fred M. Rosendfeld.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [APPLICATION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD] against Fred M. Rosendfeld (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034697), filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/19/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choice Hotels International, Inc. v. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred M. Rosendfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred M. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary E Berge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?