Walls v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Carol Faye Walls
Defendant: Pamela R Baker, Melissa Ralph and U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission
Case Number: 8:2019cv02237
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the plaintiff shall provide summons for the United States Attorney; the Clerk will take all necessary steps to issue summons and to return summons to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/10/2019. (c/m 9/10/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Order entered on August 20, 2019, filed by Carol Faye Walls. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 84637034974 (sp2, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff Twenty-one days (21) from the date of this Order to pay the full civil filing fee of $400.00 and to file a copy of the "Right to Sue letter'. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/20/2019. (c/m 8/20/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carol Faye Walls(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela R Baker, Melissa Ralph, U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission, filed by Carol Faye Walls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #3 Summons) (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela R Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Faye Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?